TX HB1162 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Summary
Relating to regulating the collection or solicitation of donated goods subsequently sold by for-profit entities or individuals; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to regulating the collection or solicitation of donated goods subsequently sold by for-profit entities or individuals; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Rob Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-05-12 | Read first time | |
2009-04-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-16 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Business & Commerce--General
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
GIFTS & DONATIONS