TX HB1174 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to payment by a municipality or river authority for certain damages caused by the municipality's or river authority's operation of a sanitary sewer system.
Title
Relating to payment by a municipality or river authority for certain damages caused by the municipality's or river authority's operation of a sanitary sewer system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
City Government--Utilities
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer