TX HB1273 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Certified Retirement Community Program.
Title
Relating to the Texas Certified Retirement Community Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-01 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |