TX HB1452 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to participation in job training and employment assistance programs by veterans and other covered persons.
Title
Relating to participation in job training and employment assistance programs by veterans and other covered persons.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Rep. Al Edwards [D] | Rep. Rob Eissler [R] | Rep. Ken Legler [R] |
Rep. Sid Miller [R] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB823 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee