TX HB1592 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain comparisons of state budgets made by the Legislative Budget Board.
Title
Relating to certain comparisons of state budgets made by the Legislative Budget Board.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |