TX HB1595 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to a documented member of the Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas hunting certain deer.
Title
Relating to a documented member of the Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas hunting certain deer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-07 | Read first time | |
2009-04-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1262 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - Left pending in committee