TX HB1644 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to admonishments given to a person charged with a misdemeanor.
Title
Relating to admonishments given to a person charged with a misdemeanor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1236 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Family Violence
PEACE OFFICERS
Weapons
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Family Violence
PEACE OFFICERS
Weapons