TX SB1236 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to admonishments given to a person charged with a misdemeanor.
Title
Relating to admonishments given to a person charged with a misdemeanor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-22 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed | |
2009-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1644 (Same As) 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Family Violence
PEACE OFFICERS
Weapons
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Family Violence
PEACE OFFICERS
Weapons