TX HB1669 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a motor vehicle mileage fee pilot program for certain motor vehicles by the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a motor vehicle mileage fee pilot program for certain motor vehicles by the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Conservation
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Energy--Conservation
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General