TX HB1711 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disaster remediation contracts.
Title
Relating to disaster remediation contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-27 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Amended | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-21 | Amended | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-29 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-29 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief