TX HB1727 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale and sale and leaseback of certain state property.
Title
Relating to the sale and sale and leaseback of certain state property.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |
2011-03-10 | Correction in referral | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control