TX HB18 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elementary class size limits in public schools.
Title
Relating to elementary class size limits in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Received from the House | |
2011-06-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Passed | |
2011-06-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Record vote | |
2011-06-10 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-06-10 | Amended | |
2011-06-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-06-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-06-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-06-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-06-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-06-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-06-03 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-06-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-02 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-06-02 | Read first time | |
2011-06-01 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts