TX HB1829 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the punishment for assault committed against certain sports participants.
Title
Relating to increasing the punishment for assault committed against certain sports participants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 1829Third Reading House (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1829Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1829Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |