TX HB1900 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain unfunded mandates on political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain unfunded mandates on political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Lon Burnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-29 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
UNFUNDED MANDATES INTERAGENCY WORK GROUP
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
UNFUNDED MANDATES INTERAGENCY WORK GROUP
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1900 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01900I.htm |