TX HB1943 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the appointment of volunteer advocates as guardians ad litem in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to the appointment of volunteer advocates as guardians ad litem in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
Rep. Valinda Bolton [D] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] |
Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2434 (Same As) 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee