TX HB2096 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the temporary exemption of certain tangible personal property related to certain multi-user data centers from the sales and use tax.
Title
Relating to the temporary exemption of certain tangible personal property related to certain multi-user data centers from the sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] |
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 2096Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 2096Third Reading House (Y: 80 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 2096Third Reading House (Y: 80 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |