TX HB230 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Summary
Relating to exempting certain schools, nonprofit athletic or sports associations, municipally owned facilities, summer camps, places of worship, and fairgrounds from certain demand charges by transmission and distribution utilities.
Title
Relating to exempting certain schools, nonprofit athletic or sports associations, municipally owned facilities, summer camps, places of worship, and fairgrounds from certain demand charges by transmission and distribution utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Jim Dunnam [D] | Rep. Dan Gattis [R] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] |
Rep. Diana Maldonado [D] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-08 | Postponed | |
2009-05-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-14 | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric