TX HB2358 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligible voters in a confirmation election for a conservation and reclamation district.
Title
Relating to eligible voters in a confirmation election for a conservation and reclamation district.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. Mary Perez [D] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1901 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 1/1/18 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Elections
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Elections
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility