TX HB2379 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the functions and administration of the Health and Human Services Commission and the commission's office of inspector general in relation to fraud, waste, and abuse in health and human services.
Title
Relating to the functions and administration of the Health and Human Services Commission and the commission's office of inspector general in relation to fraud, waste, and abuse in health and human services.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1345 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#152 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#152 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions