TX HB2430 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for the use of an insignia or design by guard companies under the Private Security Act.
Title
Relating to requirements for the use of an insignia or design by guard companies under the Private Security Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Calendars Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-09 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
PRIVATE SECURITY BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE INVESTIGATORS & PRIVATE SECURITY AGENCIES
PRIVATE SECURITY BOARD, TEXAS