TX HB2622 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-24 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-24 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for claiming an exemption from ad valorem taxation by the Dallas County Utility and Reclamation District of certain property subject to a tax abatement agreement with the district and to the validation of certain actions of the district.
Title
Relating to the procedure for claiming an exemption from ad valorem taxation by the Dallas County Utility and Reclamation District of certain property subject to a tax abatement agreement with the district and to the validation of certain actions of the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - HB 2622Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-08 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions