TX HB2651 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to certain education requirements for insurance agents who sell annuities.
Title
Relating to certain education requirements for insurance agents who sell annuities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Same As) 2009-04-16 - Referred to Insurance
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions