TX SB965 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Referred to Insurance
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Referred to Insurance
Summary
Relating to certain education requirements for insurance agents who sell annuities.
Title
Relating to certain education requirements for insurance agents who sell annuities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-19 | Filed | |
2009-02-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2651 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions