TX HB2929 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the design, development, financing, construction, and operation of certain toll projects.
Title
Relating to the design, development, financing, construction, and operation of certain toll projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar