TX HB3009 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the health care providers authorized to examine a person to determine whether the person is incapacitated for purposes of certain guardianship proceedings.
Title
Relating to the health care providers authorized to examine a person to determine whether the person is incapacitated for purposes of certain guardianship proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2148 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1519 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1471 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1519 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1471 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#2148 |
2023-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1519 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1471 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended 1-VanDeaver |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts