TX HB3048 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to remedies for nonpayment of tolls for the use of toll projects; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to remedies for nonpayment of tolls for the use of toll projects; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration