TX HB3105 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a county to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the unincorporated area of the county.
Title
Relating to the authority of a county to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the unincorporated area of the county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY ZONES
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3105 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03105I.htm |