TX HB3136 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the purposes for which certain counties may use local hotel occupancy tax revenue.
Title
Relating to the purposes for which certain counties may use local hotel occupancy tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
EDWARDS AQUIFER AUTHORITY
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
WATER
Water--General
County Government--General
EDWARDS AQUIFER AUTHORITY
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
WATER
Water--General