TX HB3160 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an election in certain municipalities to convert all or a portion of a sales and use tax originally adopted for the purpose of sports and community venues to a sales and use tax for economic development purposes.
Title
Relating to an election in certain municipalities to convert all or a portion of a sales and use tax originally adopted for the purpose of sports and community venues to a sales and use tax for economic development purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1798 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
BORDER
City Government
City Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Elections
Elections--General
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
BORDER
City Government
City Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Elections
Elections--General
Taxation
Taxation--Sales