TX HB324 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school students evaluated for purposes of accountability ratings in certain school districts.
Title
Relating to public school students evaluated for purposes of accountability ratings in certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-08-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-08-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-07-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB324 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00324I.htm |