TX HB3304 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - No action taken in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - No action taken in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the regulation of credit services organizations.
Title
Relating to the regulation of credit services organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | No action taken in subcommittee | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-19 | Correction in referral | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
DEFERRED PRESENTMENT TRANSACTIONS
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
PAYDAY LOANS
DEFERRED PRESENTMENT TRANSACTIONS
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
PAYDAY LOANS