TX HB3305 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on certain contributions by persons appointed to public office by the governor; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to restrictions on certain contributions by persons appointed to public office by the governor; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Amended RV#972 (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#871 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#871 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-06 | House | Amended |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |