TX HB3452 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-28 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-28 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the discipline of judges by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct and the legislature.
Title
Relating to the discipline of judges by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct and the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - Motion fails RV#2263 (Y: 58 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1544 (Y: 79 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1469 (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - Motion fails RV#2263 (Y: 58 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1544 (Y: 79 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1469 (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | Senate | H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported |
2023-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2263 |
2023-05-28 | House | Motion fails |
2023-05-28 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2023-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2023-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1544 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-11 | House | Postponed 5/11/22 4:00 PM |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1469 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |