TX HB3480 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting of certain overdose information and the mapping of overdoses for public safety purposes.
Title
Relating to the reporting of certain overdose information and the mapping of overdoses for public safety purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1319 |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB1319 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB1319 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23