TX HB3543 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the creation of a Don't Mess with Texas Water program to prevent illegal dumping that affects the surface waters of this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of a Don't Mess with Texas Water program to prevent illegal dumping that affects the surface waters of this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] |
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-02 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-02 | Amended | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SIGNS
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SIGNS
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
WATER
Water--General