TX HB3751 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the conditions of bond for a defendant charged with committing certain offenses against a child and to the denial of bail pending trial with respect to certain defendants who violate those conditions.
Title
Relating to the conditions of bond for a defendant charged with committing certain offenses against a child and to the denial of bail pending trial with respect to certain defendants who violate those conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-02 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1381 (Same As) 2009-04-17 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE