TX HB3781 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Health Improvement Network.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Health Improvement Network.
Sponsors
Rep. Myra Crownover [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 3781Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 3781Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 3781Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health Care Providers
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health Care Providers
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM