TX HB382 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR34 (Enabling for) 2017-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions