TX HB3845 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing for testimony of a forensic analyst in a criminal proceeding.
Title
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing for testimony of a forensic analyst in a criminal proceeding.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Calanni [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] |
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WITNESSES
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WITNESSES