TX HB390 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Internet broadcast or recording of certain open meetings.
Title
Relating to the Internet broadcast or recording of certain open meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Rep. Carl Tepper [R] | Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#467 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - Amended RV#437 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - Amended RV#437 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#467 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#437 |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |