TX HB3985 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an insurer's obligation under a preferred provider benefit plan for continuity of care for certain Medicaid recipients.
Title
Relating to an insurer's obligation under a preferred provider benefit plan for continuity of care for certain Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1666 (Same As) 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
SB1666 (Same As) 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
SB1666 (Same As) 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety