TX HB413 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Status: Introduced on December 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to extend the termination date for a reinvestment zone created under the Tax Increment Financing Act.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to extend the termination date for a reinvestment zone created under the Tax Increment Financing Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Isett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2008-12-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1105 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately
HB1004 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1004 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
City Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous