TX HB4269 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures and notice required before an individual's name is added to the central child abuse or neglect registry.
Title
Relating to the procedures and notice required before an individual's name is added to the central child abuse or neglect registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1163 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Left pending in committee
SB1163 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Left pending in committee
SB1163 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Courts
Courts--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Courts
Courts--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection