TX HB4335 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain judicial statistics and related information gathered by the Texas Judicial Council.
Title
Relating to certain judicial statistics and related information gathered by the Texas Judicial Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |