TX HB4379 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Subcommittee members named
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Subcommittee members named
Summary
Relating to certain pretrial and post-trial procedures in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to certain pretrial and post-trial procedures in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-30 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2059 (Same As) 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Personnel
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Personnel
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General