TX HB439 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Labor Day holiday in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Labor Day holiday in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-03 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |