TX HB4424 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to operations fees and child support service fees assessed by domestic relations offices.
Title
Relating to operations fees and child support service fees assessed by domestic relations offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-29 | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local