TX HB4528 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to a feasibility study and report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding the establishment of a school of law in the Texas-Mexico border region.
Title
Relating to a feasibility study and report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding the establishment of a school of law in the Texas-Mexico border region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Lawyers
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT EL PASO
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Lawyers
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT EL PASO