TX HB46 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the opportunity to correct a vote by mail application.
Title
Relating to the opportunity to correct a vote by mail application.
Sponsors
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS