TX HB469 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-17)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-17)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the establishment of incentives by this state for the implementation of certain projects to capture and sequester carbon dioxide that would otherwise be emitted into the atmosphere.
Title
Relating to the establishment of incentives by this state for the implementation of certain projects to capture and sequester carbon dioxide that would otherwise be emitted into the atmosphere.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-04 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-04 | Point of order overruled | |
2009-05-04 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-02 | Postponed | |
2009-05-02 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-02 | Amended | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-01 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time | |
2008-12-22 | Filed |